This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 13:04:28 (UTC).

THE MALTBY FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT, DECLARATION OF TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 6, 1986

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 THE MALTBY FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT, DECLARATION OF TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 6, 1986 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6043

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WALLIS KATHLEEN

Not Classified By Court

THE MALTBY FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT DECLARATION OF TRUST

Interested Party

PAYZANT JAKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LABRAN RONALD MELCHNER

ZEUTZIUS WILLIAM JOSEPH JR

Interested Party Attorney

KATOUZIAN ROSHANNE CLARA

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition To Confirm Resignation And Order For Appointment Of Trustee

6/18/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition To Confirm Resignation And Order For Appointment Of Trustee

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

7/1/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB06044

6/23/2021: Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB06044

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

6/23/2021: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Notice - Hearing

6/22/2021: Notice - Hearing

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

6/22/2021: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Joinder - Joinder to Petition Filed by Successor Trustee Kathleen Wallis to Confirm Resignation and Order Appointment of Trustee

6/21/2021: Joinder - Joinder to Petition Filed by Successor Trustee Kathleen Wallis to Confirm Resignation and Order Appointment of Trustee

Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB06044

6/21/2021: Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB06044

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Related Cases (21STPB06044 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketJoinder (Joinder to Petition Filed by Successor Trustee Kathleen Wallis to Confirm Resignation and Order Appointment of Trustee ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Related Cases (21STPB06044 ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition To Confirm Resignation And Order For Appointment Of Trustee ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATOUZIAN ROSHANNE CLARA