Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:41:13 (UTC).

THE LOYA FAMILY REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 THE LOYA FAMILY REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2632

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA THERESA

Not Classified By Court

THE LOYA FAMILY REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SIRKIN MINA NOSRATI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/13/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

5/19/2020: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

3/23/2020: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for order confirming trust

3/18/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for order confirming trust

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • Hearing08/28/2020 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice - Continuance (Notice of Continuance ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for order confirming trust ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less