This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 08:08:58 (UTC).

THE LISA FLORES LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 THE LISA FLORES LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JUAREZ, DANIEL and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4946

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JUAREZ, DANIEL

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WARNER RUTH FLORES

Not Classified By Court

THE LISA FLORES LIVING TRUST

Others

FLORES JOHN

GABRIEL MELODY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COHEN ROBERT ALAN

Other Attorneys

LE LAMDIEN THANH

DEVONNE SADARA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/27/2021: Minute Order

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

8/12/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Minute Order

4/23/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/19/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement

2/19/2021: Supplement - Supplement

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

2/19/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

11/20/2020: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

Supplement - Supplement

11/5/2020: Supplement - Supplement

Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition

11/13/2020: Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

11/13/2020: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Minute Order

11/16/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

8/5/2020: Proof of Service

Objection - Trust Petition - Objection to Trustee's Petition for Instructions

7/20/2020: Objection - Trust Petition - Objection to Trustee's Petition for Instructions

Notice - Hearing

6/29/2020: Notice - Hearing

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition For Instructions

6/29/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition For Instructions

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Hearing12/21/2021 at 1:30 PM in Probate Department MSC 250B at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (Objection - Trust Petition ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (Objection to Trustee's Petition for Instructions ); Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition For Instructions ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVONNE SADARA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE LAMDIEN THANH