This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 00:52:02 (UTC).

THE LENORE KALAN-BLOCK FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 THE LENORE KALAN-BLOCK FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8910

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEIBERT MICHAEL J.

Not Classified By Court

THE LENORE KALAN-BLOCK FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHINSKI TOBI JO

 

Court Documents

Order - Order Confirming Trust Assets

12/2/2018: Order - Order Confirming Trust Assets

Minute Order

11/30/2018: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

9/26/2018: Notice - Hearing

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

9/20/2018: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2018
  • DocketOrder (Order Confirming Trust Assets ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketPetition Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less