This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 17:31:28 (UTC).

THE KATHLEEN GIVNER PERSONAL RESIDENCE TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 8, 2000 AND DOES 1 THOUGH 100

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 THE KATHLEEN GIVNER PERSONAL RESIDENCE TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 8, 2000 AND DOES 1 THOUGH 100 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9342

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CROOYMANS KATHRYN

KING DAVID

Respondents

FOUMBERG ERIC L.

GIVNER KATHLEEN

GIVNER BRUCE

Not Classified By Court

THE KATHLEEN GIVNER PERSONAL RESIDENCE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NEMECEK FRANK WYNN

Respondent Attorneys

SPITZER DANIEL BRUCE

ADKISSON JAY DAVID

 

Court Documents

Opposition - Opposition to Kathleen Givner Demurrer to First Amended Petition

8/28/2023: Opposition - Opposition to Kathleen Givner Demurrer to First Amended Petition

Request - Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice in support of Opposition to Kathleen Givner Demurrer to First Amended Petition

8/28/2023: Request - Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice in support of Opposition to Kathleen Givner Demurrer to First Amended Petition

Request - Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

8/28/2023: Request - Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - Opposition to Demurrer of Eric L. Foumberg Kathleen Givner Trustee to First Amended Petition

8/28/2023: Opposition - Opposition to Demurrer of Eric L. Foumberg Kathleen Givner Trustee to First Amended Petition

Minute Order

8/9/2023: Minute Order

Request - Continuance (1st Request)

6/27/2023: Request - Continuance (1st Request)

Demurrer - Demurrer to First Amended Petition

6/26/2023: Demurrer - Demurrer to First Amended Petition

Declaration - Declaration of Demurring Party

6/26/2023: Declaration - Declaration of Demurring Party

Demurrer - DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION

5/24/2023: Demurrer - DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION

Request - Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION

5/24/2023: Request - Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION

Minute Order

5/4/2023: Minute Order

Amended Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP 128.7 OFF CALENDAR

4/21/2023: Amended Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP 128.7 OFF CALENDAR

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - First Amended Petition for Declaratory Relief

4/20/2023: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - First Amended Petition for Declaratory Relief

Miscellaneous Document - First Amended Petition for Declaratory Relief Part 2 of 3

4/20/2023: Miscellaneous Document - First Amended Petition for Declaratory Relief Part 2 of 3

Minute Order

3/21/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order as Order After Hearing

3/21/2023: Minute Order as Order After Hearing

Minute Order

3/14/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/14/2023: Minute Order

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/11/2023

Hearing09/11/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Demurrer Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

Hearing09/11/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

Hearing09/11/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Demurrer Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (Request for Judicial Notice in support of Opposition to Kathleen Givner Demurrer to First Amended Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (Request for Judicial Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketMail - Returned Mail (Returned Mail- Mail )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Court's Motion

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketRequest - Continuance (1st Request); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Demurring Party ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
12/13/2022

DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (Request for Judicial Notice ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketDemurrer (To Verified Petition For Declaratory Relief ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketRequest - Judicial Notice; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

DocketNotice (Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Declaratory Relief ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less