This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 02:31:40 (UTC).

THE JEWELRY THEATRE BUILDING, LLC VS ROSEMARIE BORAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 THE JEWELRY THEATRE BUILDING, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROSEMARIE BORAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0824

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE JEWELRY THEATRE BUILDING LLC

Defendants

BORAL ANDREW SANTOS DBA SO GOOD AND DELICIOUS LLC

PESO HOSPITALITY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ROSEMARIE BORAL DBA SO GOOD AND DELICIOUS LLC

TAKANA TIFFANY AKA TIFFANY AVINANTE TANAKA DBA PESO HOSPITALITY

VILLANUEVA ROBERT DBA PESO HOSPITALITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/17/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/18/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAddress for Natalia Minassian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: The Jewelry Theatre Building, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rosemarie Boral (Defendant); Andrew Santos Boral (Defendant); Peso Hospitality LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Jewelry Theatre Building, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rosemarie Boral (Defendant); Andrew Santos Boral (Defendant); Peso Hospitality LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The Jewelry Theatre Building, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rosemarie Boral (Defendant); Andrew Santos Boral (Defendant); Peso Hospitality LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less