This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 21:17:17 (UTC).

THE ISABELLE CLARK-DECES LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 THE ISABELLE CLARK-DECES LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4203

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NABOKOV PETER

Not Classified By Court

THE ISABELLE CLARK-DECES LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FELDMAN JASON KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/21/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition For Order Appointing Successor Trustee

6/3/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition For Order Appointing Successor Trustee

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition For Order Appointing Successor Trustee ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN JASON K.