This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2020 at 06:57:40 (UTC).

THE HERTZ CORPORATION VS EDDIE MOORE ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 THE HERTZ CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDDIE MOORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6557

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

MONTGOMERY MARYANN

MOORE EDDIE

DOES 1-100

MONTGOMERY MARYANN [ ]

CONWAY JOE

Cross Defendants

AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

MONTGOMERY MARYANN [ ]

CONWAY JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

BRAMLAGE GREGORY J.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION RE: 585 & 1033

4/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION RE: 585 & 1033

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

5/30/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

Minute Order -

7/17/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/15/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RULING

9/5/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

9/17/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/19/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/24/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

10/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/8/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION RE: 585(D) & 1033

10/8/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION RE: 585(D) & 1033

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - of Non Service

10/9/2018: Declaration - of Non Service

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReDismissal/Re-Submission) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Dismissal/Re-Submission) of 06/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Dismissal/Re-Submission)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReDismissal/Re-Submission) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 12:23 PM in Department 56; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Default Judgment) of 04/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by The Hertz Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by The Hertz Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Re: 585 & 1033); Filed by The Hertz Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by The Hertz Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Hertz Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706557    Hearing Date: April 29, 2020    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

THE HERTZ CORPORATION,

Plaintiff,

vs.

EDDIE MOORE, et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: BC706557

ORDER RE:

DEFAULT JUDGMENT APPLICATION

Date: April 29, 2020

Time: 3:00 p.m.

Dept. 56

Plaintiff’s default judgment application is valid in all respects except Plaintiff did not “apply for all of the relief sought . . . when application [was] made for entry of default” against Defendant Eddie Moore on August 2, 2019. (Garcia v. Politis (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 1474, 1479.) Plaintiff’s request for entry of default form did not set forth any of the relief Plaintiff now seeks via its default judgment. Any and all relief Plaintiff seeks against Defendant Eddie Moore should have been included when Plaintiff applied for entry of default against Defendant Eddie Moore.

To cure this defect in the default judgment application, Plaintiff may seek to strike the default entered against Defendant Eddie Moore on August 2, 2019, and then apply for default and default judgment together with all relief sought against Defendant Eddie Moore.

Plaintiff’s Default Judgment Application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

Dated this 29th day of April 2020

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC706557    Hearing Date: January 26, 2020    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

THE HERTZ CORPORATION,

Plaintiff,

vs.

EDDIE MOORE, et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: BC706557

ORDER RE:

DEFAULT JUDGMENT APPLICATION

Date: February 26, 2020

Time: 3:00 p.m.

Dept. 56

Plaintiff’s default judgment application is valid in all respects except Plaintiff did not “apply for all of the relief sought . . . when application [was] made for entry of default” against Defendant Eddie Moore. (Garcia v. Politis (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 1474, 1479.) Plaintiff also did not submit a summary of the case as required by California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1800(a)(1).

Plaintiff’s Default Judgment Application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

Dated this 26th day of February 2020

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court