This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:42:00 (UTC).

THE GUESTOLOGY GROUP, INC., ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 THE GUESTOLOGY GROUP, INC filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5159

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MALIBU ROADHOUSE PARTNERS INC.

PACIFIC HOSPITALITY DIVISION INC. DBA MALIBU CAF

SEMESTER BY THE SEA INC.

THE GUESTOLOGY GROUP INC. DBA CALAMIGOS GUEST RANCH & BEACH CLUB

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTSON ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorneys

HUESTON JOHN C.

FLIGOR CRAIG A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/6/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

6/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

6/6/2022: Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/31/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

5/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/27/2022

5/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/27/2022

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice (Of Court Order Re: Complex Determination); Filed by The Guestology Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Add-On Petition (Notice Of Submission Re: Southern California Edison Company?s Petition To Coordinate Add-On Case); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The Guestology Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:33 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Determination) of 05/27/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case [JCCP5000]; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Re: Southern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Guestology Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Pacific Hospitality Division, Inc. (Plaintiff); Semester By The Sea, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Guestology Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Pacific Hospitality Division, Inc. (Plaintiff); Semester By The Sea, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Guestology Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Pacific Hospitality Division, Inc. (Plaintiff); Semester By The Sea, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLIGOR CRAIG ALEXANDER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON JOHN CHARLES