This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 18:46:20 (UTC).

THE GRACE C. STEELE 1947 TRUST DATED DECEMBER 24, 1947

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 THE GRACE C STEELE 1947 TRUST DATED DECEMBER 24, 1947 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0270

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITTIER TRUST COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

THE GRACE C. STEELE 1947 TRUST

Interested Party

BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM

Other

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NUNAN TERENCE SEAMUS

Other Attorney

KENNEDY KADEN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions

12/11/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions

Notice - Hearing

12/23/2020: Notice - Hearing

Supplement

4/26/2021: Supplement

Request - Special Notice - Request for Special Notice

4/19/2021: Request - Special Notice - Request for Special Notice

Consent - To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions

4/6/2021: Consent - To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions

Consent - To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions

4/6/2021: Consent - To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions

Consent - To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions

4/6/2021: Consent - To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions

Minute Order

5/3/2021: Minute Order

Order

6/25/2021: Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketSupplement; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Request for Special Notice ); Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketConsent (To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketConsent (To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketConsent (To Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition To Ascertain Trust Beneficiaries And For Instructions ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM, PC, A BUSINESS OF is a litigant

Latest cases where WHITTIER TRUST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY KADEN