This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 15:09:38 (UTC).

THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ANTHONY VEGA, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANTHONY VEGA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1372

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

VEGA AN INDIVIDUAL ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROCHA KAREL G

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/16/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAddress for KAREL G ROCHA (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY VEGA, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY VEGA, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHONY VEGA, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROCHA KAREL G