This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 02:35:34 (UTC).

THE FROYLAN AND ROMELIA GONZALEZ FAMILY TRUST DATED MARCH 16, 2001 - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 THE FROYLAN AND ROMELIA GONZALEZ FAMILY TRUST DATED MARCH 16, 2001 - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5883

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ ARMANDO V

Decedent

THE FROYLAN AND ROMELIA GONZALEZ FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LE LAMDIEN THANH

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing

9/24/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing - Petition to Determine Claim to Property

9/24/2021: Notice - Hearing - Petition to Determine Claim to Property

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

6/14/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Petition to Determine Claim to Property ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE LAMDIEN THANH