This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2022 at 19:28:34 (UTC).

THE FOLB PARTNERSHIP, GP VS T-MOBILE USA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 THE FOLB PARTNERSHIP, GP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against T-MOBILE USA, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAIG D. KARLAN and RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0275

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CRAIG D. KARLAN

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE FOLB PARTNERSHIP GP

Defendants

T-MOBILE USA INC. ET AL.

T-MOBILE WEST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SALISIAN NEAL SAMUEL

HERICH EMIL W.

Defendant Attorney

ZONNE MELISSA K

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

6/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. LEIPZIG IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF OSC HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. LEIPZIG IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF OSC HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NEAL SALISIAN IN SUPPORT OF UPCOMING OSC HEARING AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SAME

6/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NEAL SALISIAN IN SUPPORT OF UPCOMING OSC HEARING AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SAME

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION)

6/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION)

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF NEAL S. SALISIAN FILED IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINA

2/22/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF NEAL S. SALISIAN FILED IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINA

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRAD FOLB FILED IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJU

2/22/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRAD FOLB FILED IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJU

Association of Attorney

2/17/2022: Association of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NEAL SALISIAN ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

2/18/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NEAL SALISIAN ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD FOLB ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

2/18/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD FOLB ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/18/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF THE FOLB PARTNERSHIP, GP FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/18/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF THE FOLB PARTNERSHIP, GP FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. LEIPZIG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. LEIPZIG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRAD FOLB FILED IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJU

2/22/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRAD FOLB FILED IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJU

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/22/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; MSC Timeslot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Preliminary Injuction) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injuction)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Preliminary Injuction) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injuction)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF NEAL SALISIAN IN SUPPORT OF UPCOMING OSC HEARING AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SAME); Filed by The Folb Partnership, GP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. LEIPZIG IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF OSC HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION); Filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc., et al. (Defendant); T-MOBILE WEST LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 205; MSC Timeslot (/ Bench Officer will be on Vacation new Date Issued (July 26, 2022 at 9:00 am / Notice to be Sent to Plaintiff /) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketResponse (to Notice of Related Cases); Filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc., et al. (Defendant); T-MOBILE WEST LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by The Folb Partnership, GP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by The Folb Partnership, GP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by The Folb Partnership, GP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Folb Partnership, GP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Folb Partnership, GP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Folb Partnership, GP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Folb Partnership, GP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FOLB PARTNERSHIP GP is a litigant

Latest cases where T-MOBILE WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERICH EMIL W.