This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 17:05:25 (UTC).

THE ETHEL ROEDER INTER VIVOS TRUST AGREEMENT DATED AUGUST 11, 2020

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 THE ETHEL ROEDER INTER VIVOS TRUST AGREEMENT DATED AUGUST 11, 2020 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0801

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRIFKA BONNIE

Respondent

ROEDER GLENN STEPHEN

Not Classified By Court

THE ETHEL ROEDER INTER VIVOS TRUST AGREEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

PARISER ABRAHAM I.

PARISER ABAHAM I

KERENDIAN SHAWN S.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WEISS RICHARD HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

12/17/2021: Stipulation and Order

Order

12/17/2021: Order

Minute Order

12/17/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/9/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - to Petition for Court Order

11/9/2021: Supplement - to Petition for Court Order

Minute Order

11/10/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/10/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

10/15/2021: Proof of Service

Statement - Separate Statement in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel, etc.

10/28/2021: Statement - Separate Statement in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel, etc.

Opposition - Non-Party Walter Weiss Law's Opposition to Compel Further Compliance with Deposition Subpoena and Produce Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

10/28/2021: Opposition - Non-Party Walter Weiss Law's Opposition to Compel Further Compliance with Deposition Subpoena and Produce Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Notice - Notice of Errata

10/28/2021: Notice - Notice of Errata

Notice - Non-Party Walter Weiss Law's Notice of Joinder to Respondent Glenn Roader's Opposition to Compel Further Compliance with Deposition Subpoena and Produce Document

10/28/2021: Notice - Non-Party Walter Weiss Law's Notice of Joinder to Respondent Glenn Roader's Opposition to Compel Further Compliance with Deposition Subpoena and Produce Document

Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Compliance, etc.

10/28/2021: Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Compliance, etc.

Declaration

11/3/2021: Declaration

Reply

11/3/2021: Reply

Declaration

11/3/2021: Declaration

Objection - Non-Party Walter Weiss, Law Corporation's Objections to "New Evidence" Submitted with Reply to Opposition to Compel Further Compliance with Deposition Subpoena

11/4/2021: Objection - Non-Party Walter Weiss, Law Corporation's Objections to "New Evidence" Submitted with Reply to Opposition to Compel Further Compliance with Deposition Subpoena

Objection - Trust Petition - Response and Objectiosn to Petition for 1) Court Order Invalidating Purported Trust, etc.

7/26/2021: Objection - Trust Petition - Response and Objectiosn to Petition for 1) Court Order Invalidating Purported Trust, etc.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Motion Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Ruling; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Ordered Transferred/Reassigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Related Cases (20STPB07595 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Personal Service ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (1) Court Order Invalidating Purported Trust Based On Undue Influence And Lack of Capacity ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS RICHARD HOWARD