This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 08:12:18 (UTC).

THE ESTEVAN CASTILLO ENRIQUEZ TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 THE ESTEVAN CASTILLO ENRIQUEZ TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5838

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ENRIQUEZ RAY

Interested Parties

O'DELL DIANE

SIGNAL ATTORNEY SERVICE INC

Not Classified By Court

THE ESTEVAN CASTILLO ENRIQUEZ TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRANDLIN CHRISTOPHER PAUL

Interested Party and Not Classified By Court Attorney

ARTIS TAB L

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

6/14/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

Citation - Citation issued

6/14/2021: Citation - Citation issued

Notice - Hearing

6/14/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

6/14/2021: Notice - Hearing

Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

7/6/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name/Address

7/29/2021: Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name/Address

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Clerk's Cert. of Reproduced Court Records: Transferred File

11/4/2021: Clerk's Cert. of Reproduced Court Records: Transferred File

Notice of Outgoing Transfer - Probate

11/4/2021: Notice of Outgoing Transfer - Probate

Minute Order

11/1/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketClerk's Cert. of Reproduced Court Records: Transferred File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer - Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Ordered Transferred/Reassigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDISP: Transfer Out of County (Change of Venue)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred - Other County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Change of Address/Firm Name (Notice of Change of Firm Name/Address ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (Declaration of Due Diligent Search ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCitation (Citation issued ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIGNAL ATTORNEY SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTIS TAB L. ESQ.