This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 06:15:09 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF VALENTINA ORELLANA PERALTA BY AND THROUGH ITS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, SOLEDAD PERALTA, ET AL. VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On July 14, 2022, The Estate of Valentina Orellana Peralta by and through its Successor-In-Interest, Soledad Peralta and Juan Pablo Orellana Larenas, (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Rahul Ravipudi, filed a personal injury lawsuit against City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department, William Dorsey Jones Jr., Burlington Stores Inc. and Does 1 through 50, (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages for alleged damages suffered due to defendant’s negligent, reckless, willful, wanton, intentional, and grossly negligent acts. This case was filed in the Los Angeles County Superior Court of California

The present action arises from the facts that on December 23, 2021, decedent Valentina Orellana Peralta was shot and killed by defendant William Dorsey Jones Jr. and/or Does 1 through 10, who were employed and working within the course and scope of their employment as officers of the Los Angeles Police Department, City of Los Angeles, and Does 11-25, inclusive, while she was shopping with her mother, plaintiff Soledad Peralta, at the Burlington store, located at 12121 Victory Blvd., North Hollywood, CA 91606 (hereinafter "subject property"). 

In the complaint, the plaintiffs alleged, “Defendants William Dorsey Jones Jr., Does 1 through 10, while working as officers of the Los Angeles Police Department, and acting within the course and scope of their duties, intentionally and/or negligently, and without due care, shot Valentina Orellana Peralta. As a result, Plaintiff Valentina Orellana Peralta suffered serious injuries, and ultimately died. Said Defendants had no legal justification for this shooting, and said defendants' use of force against Valentina Orellana Peralta was negligent and an unreasonable use of force.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “The manner in which the Los Angeles Police Department officers handled the situation by failing to ensure bystanders were not in danger and then negligently and recklessly opening fire in such a manner as to shoot Decedent Valentina Orellana Peralta, an innocent bystander, violated all of the policies and procedures of the Los Angeles Police Department and applicable use of force standards of care. These violations led directly to the tragic death of Valentina Orellana Peralta.”

Plaintiffs also alleged, “The City of Los Angeles and the Los Angeles Police Department negligently and poorly trained, hired, supervised and retained the officers that ultimately fired numerous rounds at or in the general vicinity of Daniel Elena Lopez which ended up killing Plaintiffs' decedent. Moreover, the Los Angeles Police Department supervisors were negligent in their control and direction of the tactics utilized by the officers at the scene. Additionally, the City of Los Angeles and the Los Angeles Police Department, and all of their employees and sworn officers, were negligent in the hiring, training, selection, retention, and discipline of the officers involved in the shooting, as well as the employees who trained the involved officers throughout their careers, from the academy to the date in question.”

The plaintiffs listed three claims for relief, including allegations of causing wrongful death by negligence and negligent infliction of emotional distress.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested for an award seeking general and compensatory damages, exemplary and punitive damages, funeral and burial expenses, loss of household services and other special damages along with the costs of suit and prejudgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2768

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARENAS INDIVIDUALLY JUAN PABLO ORELLANA

PERALTA INDIVIDUALLY SOLEDAD

THE ESTATE OF VALENTINA ORELLANA PERALTA BY AND THROUGH ITS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST SOLEDAD PERALTA

Defendants

BURLINGTON STORES INC.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

JONES JR. WILLIAM DORSEY

LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAVIPUDI RAHUL

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST

7/18/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/14/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/14/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

7/14/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2024
  • Hearing07/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2024
  • Hearing01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2023
  • Hearing12/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST); Filed by THE ESTATE OF VALENTINA ORELLANA PERALTA by and through its Successor-In-Interest, SOLEDAD PERALTA (Plaintiff); SOLEDAD PERALTA, individually (Plaintiff); JUAN PABLO ORELLANA LARENAS, individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by THE ESTATE OF VALENTINA ORELLANA PERALTA by and through its Successor-In-Interest, SOLEDAD PERALTA (Plaintiff); SOLEDAD PERALTA, individually (Plaintiff); JUAN PABLO ORELLANA LARENAS, individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by THE ESTATE OF VALENTINA ORELLANA PERALTA by and through its Successor-In-Interest, SOLEDAD PERALTA (Plaintiff); SOLEDAD PERALTA, individually (Plaintiff); JUAN PABLO ORELLANA LARENAS, individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by THE ESTATE OF VALENTINA ORELLANA PERALTA by and through its Successor-In-Interest, SOLEDAD PERALTA (Plaintiff); SOLEDAD PERALTA, individually (Plaintiff); JUAN PABLO ORELLANA LARENAS, individually (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAVIPUDI RAHUL