This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2020 at 07:41:38 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF THEODORE LEE GUNDERSON ET AL VS HOAG MEMORIAL

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 THE ESTATE OF THEODORE LEE GUNDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOAG MEMORIAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID L. MINNING, MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, JOSEPH R. KALIN and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2741

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID L. MINNING

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

JOSEPH R. KALIN

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

ZARON LORIE ANN GUNDERSON

THE ESTATE OF THEODORE LEE GUNDERSON

ANNE LORIE

ZARUM LORIE ANNE GUNDERSON

Defendants and Respondents

HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

NANCI ANDRE M.D.

DOES 1 TO 100

HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN

NANCI ANDREEA M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DOYLE SCHAFER MCMAHON LLP

CHORTANIAN JAMES ANDREW

TREDWAY DAVID RUSH

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING A CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' HEARING ON A MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL JANUARY 30, 2018 WITH DECLARATIONS BY ZARUM IN SUPPORT

1/29/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING A CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' HEARING ON A MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL JANUARY 30, 2018 WITH DECLARATIONS BY ZARUM IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND/OR VACATE JUDGMENT ON THE DECEMBER 15, 2017 HEARING

1/29/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND/OR VACATE JUDGMENT ON THE DECEMBER 15, 2017 HEARING

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

2/9/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ZARUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE AND MOTION TO RENEW MOTION TO REVOKE THE ORDER, OVERRULE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS AND GRANT PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ACCEPT LATE F

2/22/2018: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ZARUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE AND MOTION TO RENEW MOTION TO REVOKE THE ORDER, OVERRULE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS AND GRANT PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ACCEPT LATE F

NOTICE OF RULING

3/19/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS (CORRECTED)) NOTICE OF MOTION ETC.

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS (CORRECTED)) NOTICE OF MOTION ETC.

(SUPPLEMENT TO APPELLATE RECORD) PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION BY PLAINTIFF ZARUM IN SUPPORT;

5/15/2018: (SUPPLEMENT TO APPELLATE RECORD) PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION BY PLAINTIFF ZARUM IN SUPPORT;

Minute Order -

5/15/2018: Minute Order -

SUPPLEMENTAL TO APPELLATE RECORD REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (RJN 6) OF EVIDENCE AS EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION MOTION TO RENEW THE MOTION

5/15/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL TO APPELLATE RECORD REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (RJN 6) OF EVIDENCE AS EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION MOTION TO RENEW THE MOTION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

11/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

3/5/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED "X1"

3/5/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED "X1"

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION

6/9/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "X4"

10/29/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "X4"

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

12/21/2017: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

DEFENDANT, ANREEA A. NANC I, M.D.'S, REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

12/7/2017: DEFENDANT, ANREEA A. NANC I, M.D.'S, REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

11/21/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT;, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/21/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT;, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

197 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued ("X2"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued ("X3"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued ("X4"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued ("X5"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 9/25/20, "X3"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 9/25/20, "X2"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 9/25/20, "X5"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 9/25/20, "X4"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("X2"); Filed by LORIE ANN GUNDERSON ZARON (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
337 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ARSIHA MARDASI, ESQ. RE PARTIES' MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL, PROCEDURE 430.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT;, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by ANDREEA, M.D. NANCI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lorie Anne Gunderson Zarum (Plaintiff); THE ESTATE OF THEODORE LEE GUNDERSON (Plaintiff); LORIE ANN GUNDERSON ZARON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC672741    Hearing Date: June 23, 2020    Dept: 51

Plaintiff’s Request for Judicial Notice is granted.

The Court has read and considered Plaintiff’s motion to set aside Judge Raphael’s March 12, 2018, order of dismissal and the oppositions thereto. The motion as denied because it is untimely and there are no new facts that would warrant such relief.

Defendant Hoag Memorial Hospital’s request for attorney’s fee is denied.