This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 14:08:59 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF JAKEIL REYNOLDS, ET AL. VS FREETOWN HOLDINGS COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 THE ESTATE OF JAKEIL REYNOLDS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FREETOWN HOLDINGS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0229

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REYNOLDS JOHNNY

THE ESTATE OF JAKEIL REYNOLDS

REYNOLDS PAULA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SHERIFF ABDUL JAMAL

FREETOWN HOLDINGS COMPANY

Cross Defendants

TASBY MAKEVA

WHITE TYLON DESHAWN GEOFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLOUGHBY ANTHONY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ASH PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Hearing04/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Freetown Holdings Company (Cross-Complainant); Abdul Jamal Sheriff (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Freetown Holdings Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Freetown Holdings Company (Defendant); Abdul Jamal Sheriff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Freetown Holdings Company (Defendant); Abdul Jamal Sheriff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Freetown Holdings Company (Defendant); Abdul Jamal Sheriff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Freetown Holdings Company (Defendant); Abdul Jamal Sheriff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Freetown Holdings Company (Defendant); Abdul Jamal Sheriff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by The Estate of Jakeil Reynolds (Plaintiff); Paula Reynolds (Plaintiff); Johnny Reynolds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER RE DEMURRER/MOTION TO STRIKE; AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING, PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 430.41(a)(2) AND 435.5(a)(2)); Filed by Freetown Holdings Company (Defendant); Abdul Jamal Sheriff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The Estate of Jakeil Reynolds (Plaintiff); Paula Reynolds (Plaintiff); Johnny Reynolds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The Estate of Jakeil Reynolds (Plaintiff); Paula Reynolds (Plaintiff); Johnny Reynolds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by The Estate of Jakeil Reynolds (Plaintiff); Paula Reynolds (Plaintiff); Johnny Reynolds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Estate of Jakeil Reynolds (Plaintiff); Paula Reynolds (Plaintiff); Johnny Reynolds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Estate of Jakeil Reynolds (Plaintiff); Paula Reynolds (Plaintiff); Johnny Reynolds (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREETOWN HOLDINGS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASH PAUL