This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2022 at 06:36:09 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF ANNA NICOLE SMITH, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JEFFREE STAR COSMETICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 THE ESTATE OF ANNA NICOLE SMITH, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JEFFREE STAR COSMETICS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1021

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF ANNA NICOLE SMITH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

JEFFREE STAR COSMETICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATRINAK RAYMOND PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/26/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY AND CONDUCT A MEDIATION

12/4/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY AND CONDUCT A MEDIATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF S MICHAEL KERNAN PROVIDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, AND REQUEST TO SET AN OSC

2/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF S MICHAEL KERNAN PROVIDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, AND REQUEST TO SET AN OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by The Estate of Anna Nicole Smith, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of S Michael Kernan Providing Notice of Settlement, and Request to Set an OSC); Filed by The Estate of Anna Nicole Smith, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by The Estate of Anna Nicole Smith, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to Conduct Limited Discovery and Conduct a Mediation); Filed by Jeffree Star Cosmetics, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Estate of Anna Nicole Smith, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Estate of Anna Nicole Smith, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Estate of Anna Nicole Smith, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Estate of Anna Nicole Smith, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATRINAK RAYMOND PAUL