This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 19:20:17 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF ANANIAS KING (A/K/A ANANIAS KING, JR.), DECEASED - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 THE ESTATE OF ANANIAS KING A/K/A ANANIAS KING, JR , DECEASED - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2404

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LC EQUITY GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Respondents

CHRISTOPHER DAMON KING AN INDIVIDUAL AND HEIR TO ANANIAS KING A/K/A ANANIAS KI

JUAN ANANIAS KING AN INDIVIDUAL AND HEIR TO ANANIAS KING A/K/A ANANIAS KING JR

KAHLIL VON KING SR. AN INDIVIDUAL HEIR TO ANANIAS KING A/K/A ANANIAS KING J

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF ANANIAS KING A/K/A ANANIAS KING JR.

Not Classified By Court

THE ESTATE OF ANANIAS KING A/K/A ANANIAS KING JR. DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WRITER COURTNEY FRANCES

 

Court Documents

Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial) - PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING REAL PROPERTY VESTED IN THE NAME OF TRUST AND CONFIRMING LIENHOLD INTEREST OF PARTY(IES) IN INTEREST (Case Initia

12/13/2022: Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial) - PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING REAL PROPERTY VESTED IN THE NAME OF TRUST AND CONFIRMING LIENHOLD INTEREST OF PARTY(IES) IN INTEREST (Case Initia

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/4/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/4/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing (Notices)

1/17/2023: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing (Notices)

Notice - Notice of Unavailabity of Counsel

1/27/2023: Notice - Notice of Unavailabity of Counsel

Affidavit - Due Diligence

1/31/2023: Affidavit - Due Diligence

Proof of Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Service

Supplement - Verified Supplement to Petition for Order Confirming Real property, 2/22/23

2/17/2023: Supplement - Verified Supplement to Petition for Order Confirming Real property, 2/22/23

Minute Order

2/22/2023: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement (Comment)

4/20/2023: Supplement - Supplement (Comment)

Minute Order

4/25/2023: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketPetition Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketSupplement (Verified Supplement to Petition for Order Confirming Real property, 2/22/23 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAffidavit (Due Diligence ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Unavailabity of Counsel ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAffidavit (AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAffidavit (AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPetition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial) (PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING REAL PROPERTY VESTED IN THE NAME OF TRUST AND CONFIRMING LIENHOLD INTEREST OF PARTY(IES) IN INTEREST (Case Initiation) ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less