This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 13:52:49 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF ADAM ROBERT MORALES MORALES, ET AL. VS GLENN WAYNE COOK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 THE ESTATE OF ADAM ROBERT MORALES MORALES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GLENN WAYNE COOK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6963

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORALES ELAINE

MORALES THE ESTATE OF ADAM ROBERT MORALES

Defendants

COOK GLENN WAYNE

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENE R BROWNE

NICKERSON CHRISTIAN T F

Defendant Attorney

SHAVER THOMAS WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

7/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

7/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

7/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/22/2021: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

7/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

Answer

8/27/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2024
  • Hearing07/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Hearing01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Hearing01/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Glenn Wayne Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Glenn Wayne Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The Estate of Adam Robert Morales Morales (Plaintiff); Elaine Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by The Estate of Adam Robert Morales Morales (Plaintiff); Elaine Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Successor in Interest); Filed by The Estate of Adam Robert Morales Morales (Plaintiff); Elaine Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Estate of Adam Robert Morales Morales (Plaintiff); Elaine Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Estate of Adam Robert Morales Morales (Plaintiff); Elaine Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Estate of Adam Robert Morales Morales (Plaintiff); Elaine Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENE R. BROWNE ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICKERSON CHRISTIAN T F