Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 09:40:40 (UTC).

THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FBO JAMES MARTIN CLARK, ACCOUNT NUMBER 7230011412 VS BLOCK ENTERPRISE GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 THE ENTRUST GROUP INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION FBO JAMES MARTIN CLARK, ACCOUNT NUMBER 7230011412 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BLOCK ENTERPRISE GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FBO JAMES MARTIN CLARK ACCOUNT NUMBER 7230011412

Defendants

ARMOR CLIFTON

BLOCK ENTERPRISE GROUP

KBK CONSULTANT GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROYAL KEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COLEMAN JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT KBK CONSULTANT GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

3/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT KBK CONSULTANT GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT KEVA ROYAL

3/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT KEVA ROYAL

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT BLOCK ENTERPRISE GROUP

3/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT BLOCK ENTERPRISE GROUP

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT CLIFTON ARMOR

3/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT CLIFTON ARMOR

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (KBK Consultant Group, Inc., a California Corporation); Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (Clifton Armor); Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (as to Defendant Keva Royal); Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (as to Defendant Block Enterprise Group); Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Entrust Group Inc. a Delaware Corporation FBO James Martin Clark, Account Number 7230011412 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FBO JAMES MARTIN CLARK ACCOUNT NUMBER 7230011412 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLEMAN JONATHAN