This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 21:06:44 (UTC).

THE EDWARD E. VICKERS TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 THE EDWARD E VICKERS TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6669

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VICKERS RYAN

Not Classified By Court

THE EDWARD E. VICKERS TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GOULD RODNEY THOMAS

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BAYLEY GUY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

7/7/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

Notice - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT???CIVIL (Signed)

7/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT???CIVIL (Signed)

Notice - Hearing

7/19/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

7/16/2021: Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

Objection - Trust Petition

8/26/2021: Objection - Trust Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • Hearing02/03/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT???CIVIL (Signed) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOULD RODNEY THOMAS