This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 00:37:48 (UTC).

THE DINGMAN GROUP INC., VS URBAN COMPASS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 THE DINGMAN GROUP INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against URBAN COMPASS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5894

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE DINGMAN GROUP INC.

Defendants

URBAN COMPASS INC. DBA COMPASS

DEDEFF JORDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMBIS ALEXANDRA R. ESQ.

RAMBIS ALEXANDRA R.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/11/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Settlement

1/25/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/25/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 03/25/2021

3/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 03/25/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/2/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/22/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/22/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/18/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by The Dingman Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 03/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by The Dingman Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING); Filed by The Dingman Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by The Dingman Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The Dingman Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Dingman Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Dingman Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Dingman Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URBAN COMPASS INC. DBA COMPASS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMBIS ALEXANDRA RACHEL