Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 19:29:59 (UTC).

THE CITY OF LA VERNE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS EDWARD BEAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 THE CITY OF LA VERNE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against EDWARD BEAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GLORIA WHITE-BROWN and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0135

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE CITY OF LA VERNE A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Respondents

BEAS EDWARD

SANCHEZ CAROL BEAS

ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 1816 1ST STREET LA VERNE CALIFORNIA

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POPE AMANDA ALQUIST

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/30/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

4/13/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER

4/13/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

4/13/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER;)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER;)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

4/16/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE SUBSTANDARD BUILDING AND APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

3/25/2021: Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE SUBSTANDARD BUILDING AND APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF J CROOK ISO PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPT RECEIVER

3/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF J CROOK ISO PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPT RECEIVER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF E BEATTY ISO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

3/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF E BEATTY ISO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF T PLAINS ISO PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPT RECEIVER

3/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF T PLAINS ISO PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPT RECEIVER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF A POPE ISO PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPT RECEIVER

3/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF A POPE ISO PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPT RECEIVER

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Hearing05/05/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Hearing04/20/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Directing Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Order Directing Service of Summons); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For Appointment of Receiver) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Appointment of Receiver;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Appointment of Receiver); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of E Beatty iso Petition for Appointment of Receiver); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of J Crook iso Petition for Order to Abate and Appt Receiver); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of C Leeper iso Petition for Order to Abate and Appt Receiver); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of T Plains iso Petition for Order to Abate and Appt Receiver); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of A Pope iso Petition for Order to Abate and Appt Receiver); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPetition (Petition for Order to Abate Substandard Building and Appointment of Receiver); Filed by The City of La Verne, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LA VERNE is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Alquist Pope