This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 13:08:07 (UTC).

THE CITY OF GARDENA, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS VISIONQUEST VENTURES II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 THE CITY OF GARDENA, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against VISIONQUEST VENTURES II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0088

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE CITY OF GARDENA A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Respondent

VISIONQUEST VENTURES II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POPE AMANDA ALQUIST

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

3/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Hearing on Petition

3/29/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Hearing on Petition

3/29/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LOIS MOY IN SUPPORT OF CITY'S PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPOINT RECEIVER

3/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LOIS MOY IN SUPPORT OF CITY'S PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPOINT RECEIVER

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE SUBSTANDARD BUILDING AND APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

3/24/2021: Petition - PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE SUBSTANDARD BUILDING AND APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DIRECTOR OF CODE ENFORCEMENT STEPHANY SANTIN IN SUPPORT OF CITY'S PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPOINT RECEIVER

3/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DIRECTOR OF CODE ENFORCEMENT STEPHANY SANTIN IN SUPPORT OF CITY'S PETITION FOR ORDER TO ABATE AND APPOINT RECEIVER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC P. BEATTY IN SUPPORT OF CITY'S PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

3/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC P. BEATTY IN SUPPORT OF CITY'S PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • Hearing05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Petition to Abate Substandard Building and Appointment of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by The City of Gardena, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by The City of Gardena, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The City of Gardena, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Lois Moy in Support of City's Petition for Order to Abate and Appoint Receiver); Filed by The City of Gardena, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Director of Code Enforcement Stephany Santin in Support of City's Petition for Order to Abate and Appoint Receiver); Filed by The City of Gardena, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPetition (for Order to Abate Substandard Building and Appointment of Receiver); Filed by The City of Gardena, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Eric P. Beatty in Support of City's Petition for Appointment of Receiver); Filed by The City of Gardena, a California Municipal Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Alquist Pope