This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2023 at 13:51:39 (UTC).

THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS DETROIT SUPPLY CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DETROIT SUPPLY CO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0955

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

DETROIT SUPPLY CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/19/2023

1/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/19/2023

Default Judgment

1/19/2023: Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/10/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of the Case

1/10/2023: Statement of the Case

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/10/2023: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

1/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/7/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED 11/15/2022

11/7/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED 11/15/2022

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

11/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

9/21/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/21/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/21/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Detroit Supply Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. against Defendant Detroit Supply Co., a California Corporation on the Complaint filed by The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. on 09/21/2022 for damages of $52,565.00, attorney fees of $1,941.30, interest of $4,882.06, and costs of $515.00 for a total of $59,903.36.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 01/19/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date changed from 01/19/2023 to 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. on 09/21/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc., does Only DOES 1-50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Detroit Supply Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Detroit Supply Co. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Detroit Supply Co., a California Corporation to Detroit Supply Co.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yolanda Orozco in Department 31 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Detroit Supply Co., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Detroit Supply Co., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Detroit Supply Co., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less