Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:38:32 (UTC).

THE CHUGH FIRM, APC VS SAMRA PRODUCE & FARMS INC.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 THE CHUGH FIRM, APC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAMRA PRODUCE FARMS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN F. GASDIA and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6628

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN F. GASDIA

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHUGH FIRM THE APC

Defendants

SINGH HARBHAJAN

PUNJAB FARMS INC.

MACHHIANA LLC

SAMRA PRODUCE & FARMS INC.

HARJOT LLC

SAMRA HARBHAJAN SINGH AN INDIVIDUAL

SAMRA HARBHAJAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRABECK PAUL R. LAW OFFICES OF

BRABECK PAUL RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/11/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document

10/11/2017: Legacy Document

Summons

10/11/2017: Summons

Legacy Document

11/8/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

12/15/2017: Legacy Document

Minute Order

3/27/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

5/18/2018: Legacy Document

Request

7/5/2018: Request

Request

7/5/2018: Request

Request

7/5/2018: Request

Case Management Statement

7/13/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

7/13/2018: Minute Order

Brief

5/9/2019: Brief

Minute Order

5/15/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/15/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/16/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/16/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/16/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE, APC CHUGH FIRM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE, APC CHUGH FIRM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE, APC CHUGH FIRM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE, APC CHUGH FIRM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding service/answer/responsive pleading/default as to defendants Harjot, LLC; Machiana LLC; Punjab Farms, Inc. and Samra Produce & Farms, Inc.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 10/26/17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 10/26/17 Declaration of Diligence attached ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by THE, APC CHUGH FIRM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by THE, APC CHUGH FIRM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by THE, APC CHUGH FIRM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by THE, APC CHUGH FIRM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC066628    Hearing Date: July 01, 2020    Dept: SEC

THE CHUGH LAW FIRM v. SAMRA PRODUCE & FARMS INC., et al.

CASE NO.: VC066628

HEARING: 7/1/20

[Remote appearances are encouraged and will be given priority.]

#15

TENTATIVE ORDER

I. Defendant Machhiana LLC’s motion for relief from default and default judgment is GRANTED. Defendant is ordered to file and serve its Answer within 5 days. Sanctions are imposed against Machhiana LLC in the sum of $1,000, payable within 30 days to Plaintiff.

II. Defendant Punjab Farms, Inc.’s motion for relief from default and default judgment is GRANTED. Defendant is ordered to file and serve its Answer within 5 days. Sanctions are imposed against Punjab Farms, Inc. in the sum of $1,000, payable within 30 days to Plaintiff.

III. Defendant Harjot LLC’s motion for relief from default and default judgment is GRANTED. Defendant is ordered to file and serve its Answer within 5 days. Sanctions are imposed against Defendant Machhiana LLC in the sum of $1,000, payable within 30 days to Plaintiff.

IV. Defendant Samra Produce & Farms, Inc.’s motion for relief from default and default judgment is GRANTED. Defendant is ordered to file and serve its Answer within 5 days. Sanctions are imposed against Samra Produce & Farms, Inc. in the sum of $1,000, payable within 30 days to Plaintiff.

Moving Parties to give NOTICE.

Defendants Machhiana LLC, Punjab Farms, Inc., Harjot LLC, and Samra Produce & Farms, Inc. move to set aside defaults pursuant to CCP § 473(b).

The court may, upon any terms as may be just, relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect. Application for this relief shall be accompanied by a copy of the answer or other pleading proposed to be filed therein, otherwise the application shall not be granted, and shall be made within a reasonable time, in no case exceeding six months, after the judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken. (CCP § 473(b).) Where the Plaintiff files no counteraffidavit and makes no showing that he has suffered any prejudice or that injustice will result from the trial of the case on its merits, very slight evidence will be required to justify a court in setting aside the default. (Weitz v. Yankosky (1966) 63 Cal.2d 849, 859.)

Defaults were entered against moving Defendants on 11/26/19.

Individual Defendant Harbhajan Singh declares that the entity Defendants did not file Answers because Singh was under the mistaken belief that Answers were not necessary because he personally signed the retainer agreement with Plaintiff. (Singh Decl., ¶ 4.)

The court accepts Defendants’ declaration of mistake, and the motions are GRANTED. Defendants are ORDERED to file and serve their Answers within 5 days.

SANCTIONS: (1) Whenever the court grants relief from a default, default judgment, or dismissal based on any of the provisions of this section, the court may do any of the following: (A) Impose a penalty of no greater than one thousand dollars ($1,000) upon an offending attorney or party. (B) Direct that an offending attorney pay an amount no greater than one thousand dollars ($1,000) to the State Bar Client Security Fund. (C) Grant other relief as is appropriate. (CCP 473(c).) The court finds that sanctions are warranted in this instance because Defendants’ failure to file timely Answers caused Plaintiff unnecessary delay and costs.

Sanctions are imposed against Defendant Machhiana LLC in the sum of $1,000, payable within 30 days to Plaintiff.

Sanctions are imposed against Punjab Farms, Inc. in the sum of $1,000, payable within 30 days to Plaintiff.

Sanctions are imposed against Harjot LLC in the sum of $1,000, payable within 30 days to Plaintiff.

Sanctions are imposed against Samra Produce & Farms, Inc. in the sum of $1,000, payable within 30 days to Plaintiff.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CHUGH FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRABECK PAUL R.