This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 02:34:53 (UTC).

THE BRIAN R. LISTER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED OCTOBER 7, 2020

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 THE BRIAN R LISTER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED OCTOBER 7, 2020 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2991

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CHEN JIN

BROWN JOYCE

LISTER EDMUND

Not Classified By Court

THE BRIAN R. LISTER REVOCABLE TRUST

Trustee

ELDRIDGE JOANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HSU ROGER C

 

Court Documents

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice

6/10/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice

6/10/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice

6/10/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice

Proof of Service - Verified Petition Probate 850; Notice of hearing

6/29/2021: Proof of Service - Verified Petition Probate 850; Notice of hearing

Proof of Service - Verified Petition Probate 850; Notice of hearing.

6/29/2021: Proof of Service - Verified Petition Probate 850; Notice of hearing.

Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

7/9/2021: Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

7/9/2021: Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

7/9/2021: Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

7/9/2021: Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

7/9/2021: Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

7/9/2021: Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

7/9/2021: Notice - Notice of Pendency of Action

Supplement - Supplement to Verified Petition for Modification or Termination of Trust Provision

8/13/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Verified Petition for Modification or Termination of Trust Provision

Minute Order

8/17/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Declaration of Roger C. Hsu in Support of Supplement to Verified Petition

8/18/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Roger C. Hsu in Support of Supplement to Verified Petition

Supplement - Supplement to Verified Petition

8/18/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Verified Petition

Minute Order

8/23/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

3/30/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Successor Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Successor Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMotion - Change of Venue (Motion for Change of Venue ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Roger C. Hsu in Support of Supplement to Verified Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketPetition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROGER C.