This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 20:44:24 (UTC).

THE BRAULT FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 THE BRAULT FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0537

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BRAULT DEL

BRAULT FUELLING ANDREA M.

FUELLING FOX MADISON

FUELLING JORDAN

FUELLING MEGAN

Not Classified By Court

THE BRAULT FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BIRKEL JULIA LYNN

MERRIAM-REHWALD JEFFREY ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/29/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/29/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/29/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/29/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/29/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/29/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Approval of First Trust Accounting

6/16/2022: Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Approval of First Trust Accounting

Opposition - PETITIONER DEL BRAULT???S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT ANDREA BRAULT FUELLING???S DEMURRER TO AMENDED PETITION PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE SECTION 850; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (Oppo

6/16/2022: Opposition - PETITIONER DEL BRAULT???S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT ANDREA BRAULT FUELLING???S DEMURRER TO AMENDED PETITION PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE SECTION 850; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (Oppo

Reply - In Support of Demurrer

6/22/2022: Reply - In Support of Demurrer

Minute Order

6/2/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/21/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling on Petition fpr Instructions Approving and Validating Trust Instruments, and Approving Reallocations of Assets Among Subtrusts

7/7/2021: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling on Petition fpr Instructions Approving and Validating Trust Instruments, and Approving Reallocations of Assets Among Subtrusts

Supplement - To Petition for Instructions Approving and Validating Trust Instruments, and Approving Reallocations of Assets Among Subtrusts

7/7/2021: Supplement - To Petition for Instructions Approving and Validating Trust Instruments, and Approving Reallocations of Assets Among Subtrusts

Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Instructions Approving and Validating Trust Instruments, and Approving Reallocations of Assets Among Subtrusts

7/7/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Instructions Approving and Validating Trust Instruments, and Approving Reallocations of Assets Among Subtrusts

Petition - Compel - Petition to Compel Accounting; Petition to Determine Breach of Trust; Petition for Instructions re: Scope

8/13/2021: Petition - Compel - Petition to Compel Accounting; Petition to Determine Breach of Trust; Petition for Instructions re: Scope

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition - Trust (Subsequent)

8/13/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition - Trust (Subsequent)

Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition

8/13/2021: Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

8/24/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • Hearing11/03/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Hearing11/03/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Hearing11/03/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Hearing11/03/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Petition Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Demurrer Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Not Held - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Instructions Approving and Validating Trust Instruments. and Approving Reallocations of Assets Among Subtrusts ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERRIAM-REHWALD JEFFREY ALLEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIRKEL JULIA LYNN