This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 08:15:42 (UTC).

THE BN FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 5, 2000 VS BOB TERMECHI ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 THE BN FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 5, 2000 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BOB TERMECHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6408

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

THE BN FAMILHY TRUST

THE BN FAMILY TRUST

ROBERT GENTIO TRUSTEE OF THE BN FAMILY TRUST

GENTINO ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

TERMECHI BOB

YAGBHOOBIA BIZHAN

YAGHOOBIA BIZHAN

YAGHOOBIA AVIVA

YAGHOOBIA [DOE 1] AVIVA

YAGHOOBIA BIZHAN AKA BIJAN YAGHOOBIA

GEOULA MAHNAZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GENTINO ROBERT

GENTINO ROBERT ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COTE DANIEL R. ESQ.

COTE DANIEL ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Reply - DEFENDANT BIJAN YAGHOOBIA'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH STATUTORY REQUIREMENT OF PROBATE COURT SE

8/3/2020: Reply - DEFENDANT BIJAN YAGHOOBIA'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH STATUTORY REQUIREMENT OF PROBATE COURT SE

Motion to Dismiss

6/22/2020: Motion to Dismiss

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/19/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR AN ORDER

6/20/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR AN ORDER

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

8/21/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Motion

8/21/2019: Notice of Motion

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT BIJAN YAGHOOBIA IN RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF JOSEPH PAUL BREGMAN

1/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT BIJAN YAGHOOBIA IN RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF JOSEPH PAUL BREGMAN

Proof of Service by Mail

8/16/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; TRIAL SETTIN...)

8/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; TRIAL SETTIN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; HEARING ON MO...)

8/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; HEARING ON MO...)

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT GENTINO'S OPPOSITION

7/22/2019: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT GENTINO'S OPPOSITION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

6/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Answer - ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/5/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF IDC

3/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF IDC

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR 1. QUIET TITLE ;ETC

5/16/2018: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR 1. QUIET TITLE ;ETC

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • Hearing11/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (Rescheduled Motion for Leave to File a Cross Complaint); Filed by Bizhan Yaghoobia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Bizhan Yaghoobia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Bizhan Yaghoobia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOpposition (to motion for leave to amend); Filed by Robert Gentino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
187 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by The BN Family Trust Dated June 5, 2000 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR 1. QUIET TITLE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The BN Family Trust Dated June 5, 2000 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706408    Hearing Date: August 19, 2020    Dept: 30