This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2022 at 05:05:51 (UTC).

THE BICYCLE CASINO, A PARTNERSHIP VS FARHAD MOMENI

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 THE BICYCLE CASINO, A PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FARHAD MOMENI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0148

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BICYCLE CASINO A PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

MOMENI FARHAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARK JEROME

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/2/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • Hearing07/06/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Bicycle Casino, a partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Bicycle Casino, a partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Bicycle Casino, a partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BICYCLE CASINO A PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STARK JEROME