This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:59:01 (UTC).

THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. VS MONICA BERLIN

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MONICA BERLIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7540

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AMAYA MARBELLA

HAWORTH M.D. RANDAL D.

SKILLENS STAR

THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BERLIN MONICA

JENKINS SHEGELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARENS ARTHUR H.

OSTER MATTHEW

OSTER MATTHEW X

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BOIES SCHILLER & FLEXNER

CALDWELL LESLIE & PROCTOR

MARQUI HOOD

HOOD MARQUI

WILLINGHAM DAVID KARL

HOOD MARQUI JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/18/2017: Complaint

Cross-Complaint

6/21/2018: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Settlement

11/7/2018: Notice of Settlement

Summons

5/18/2017: Summons

Unknown

6/15/2017: Unknown

Answer

8/17/2017: Answer

Notice

9/18/2017: Notice

Minute Order

10/3/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

11/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/10/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/26/2018: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

2/26/2018: Notice of Ruling

Substitution of Attorney

3/22/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

3/29/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

5/22/2018: Unknown

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

6/20/2018: Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Answer

7/26/2018: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

3/22/2018: Substitution of Attorney

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (re settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff); M.D., RANDAL D. HAWORTH (Plaintiff); STAR SKILLENS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (on 11-8-18 Hearing & Order Setting OSC); Filed by MONICA BERLIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (Of Entire Case); Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Answer; Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by SHEGELL JENKINS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Declaration (OF MENAL IBRAHIM ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff); M.D., RANDAL D. HAWORTH (Plaintiff); STAR SKILLENS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff); M.D., RANDAL D. HAWORTH (Plaintiff); STAR SKILLENS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSTER MATTHEW X

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARENS ARTHUR HUGO