Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2020 at 03:46:02 (UTC).

THE ALFRED MANOOKIAN AND HELEN MANOOKIAN FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 THE ALFRED MANOOKIAN AND HELEN MANOOKIAN FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3889

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MANOOKIAN PAMELA

Not Classified By Court

THE ALFRED MANOOKIAN AND HELEN MANOOKIAN FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST

Other

MANOOKIAN STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCLAUGHLIN ABIGAIL

Other Attorney

LALAZARIAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/20/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/9/2019: Minute Order

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continued Hearing

7/11/2019: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continued Hearing

Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition

7/3/2019: Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition

Minute Order

7/8/2019: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing First Account Current and Report of Trustee and Petition for Settlement Thereof

4/26/2019: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing First Account Current and Report of Trustee and Petition for Settlement Thereof

Accounting - Trust (Initial) - First Account Currecnt and Report of Trustee and Petition For Settlement Thereof

4/25/2019: Accounting - Trust (Initial) - First Account Currecnt and Report of Trustee and Petition For Settlement Thereof

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • Hearing01/27/2020 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Accounting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling and Continued Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (Objection - Trust Petition ); Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing First Account Current and Report of Trustee and Petition for Settlement Thereof ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketAccounting - Trust (Initial) (First Account Currecnt and Report of Trustee and Petition For Settlement Thereof ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LALAZARIAN DAVID