This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2023 at 21:44:49 (UTC).

TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY LLC ET AL VS REBECCA RICKLEY

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against REBECCA RICKLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN, RUTH ANN KWAN, WILLIAM F. FAHEY, TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6002

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

RUTH ANN KWAN

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants, Plaintiffs and Respondents

TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC

THRIFTY OIL CO.

GULF OIL CORPORATION

FIEDLER GROUP [ROE 12]

BP WEST COAST PRODUCTS LLC

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

RD BUILDERS INC.

FIEDLER GROUP

Cross Plaintiffs, Appellants and Defendants

ROIT NATASHA

RICKLEY REBECCA

GULF OIL CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

WILCOX WIL S

MYERS PAMELA L

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

RODRIGUEZ CESAR

ALDERSON ANITA

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ROIT NATASHA

Cross Defendant Attorneys

GILBERT WARREN L.

COVINGTON MATTHEW STONE

BERGSTEN ROBERT

GARCIA REED & RAMIREZ LLP

O'CONNOR SEAN PATRICK

STEWART BRIAN K.

MEYER ABBY

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE DESIGNATION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS FOR TRANSMITTAL

8/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE DESIGNATION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS FOR TRANSMITTAL

Notice - NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COSTS WITH FULL RESERVATION OF RIGHTS

4/27/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COSTS WITH FULL RESERVATION OF RIGHTS

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED NOA 4/6/22 B320358 INADEQUATE FUNDS

1/25/2023: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED NOA 4/6/22 B320358 INADEQUATE FUNDS

Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT NOTICE OF OVERDUE COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPTS

12/7/2022: Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT NOTICE OF OVERDUE COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPTS

Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT B317441 & B320358; DCA CONSOLIDATION ORDER

8/29/2022: Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT B317441 & B320358; DCA CONSOLIDATION ORDER

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript

8/23/2022: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript

Objection - OBJECTION TO AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS PERTAINING TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT

8/22/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS PERTAINING TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 20, 20...)

8/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 20, 20...)

Notice of Ruling

8/18/2022: Notice of Ruling

Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

8/18/2022: Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

Reply - REPLY TO ROITRICKLEY OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 20, 2018 SITE INSPECTION ORDER ANDOR TO SHORTEN TIME TO HAVE THE MATTER HEARD BY NO LATER THAN AUGUST 22, 2022

8/17/2022: Reply - REPLY TO ROITRICKLEY OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 20, 2018 SITE INSPECTION ORDER ANDOR TO SHORTEN TIME TO HAVE THE MATTER HEARD BY NO LATER THAN AUGUST 22, 2022

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 20, 2018 SITE INSPECTION ORDER AND/OR TO SHORTEN TIME TO HAVE THE MATTER HEARD BY NO LATER THAN AUGUST 22, 2022

8/17/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 20, 2018 SITE INSPECTION ORDER AND/OR TO SHORTEN TIME TO HAVE THE MATTER HEARD BY NO LATER THAN AUGUST 22, 2022

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF EFRAT M. COGAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 20, 2018 SITE INSPECTION ORDER

8/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF EFRAT M. COGAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 20, 2018 SITE INSPECTION ORDER

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/17/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

Order - ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS OF THRIFTY OIL AND TESORO REFINING & MARKETING AND AWARDING COST

8/15/2022: Order - ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS OF THRIFTY OIL AND TESORO REFINING & MARKETING AND AWARDING COST

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF LEASE AND INTERESTS IN JUDGMENT AND CLAIMS AND ELECTION TO CONTINUE TO PROSECUTE ACTION IN THE NAME OF TESORO REFINING MARKETING COMPANY LLC

8/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF LEASE AND INTERESTS IN JUDGMENT AND CLAIMS AND ELECTION TO CONTINUE TO PROSECUTE ACTION IN THE NAME OF TESORO REFINING MARKETING COMPANY LLC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION)

8/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON FIEDLER’S MOTION TO VERIFY COMPLIANCE WITH AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES PURSUANT TO CCP § 411.35(H)

8/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON FIEDLER’S MOTION TO VERIFY COMPLIANCE WITH AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES PURSUANT TO CCP § 411.35(H)

1,193 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketNotice Designation of Trial Exhibits for Transmittal; Filed by: Fiedler Group [ROE 12] (Respondent); As to: Natasha Roit (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Payment of Costs with Full Reservation of Rights; Filed by: Rebecca Rickley (Defendant); Natasha Roit (Defendant); As to: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid Paid for appellants Rebecca Rickley & Natasha Roit; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid paid for appellants Rebecca Rickley & Natasha Roit; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA 4/6/22 B320358 INADEQUATE FUNDS; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid For Tesoro Refining; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid For Tesoro Refining; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketAppeal Document Notice of overdue court reporter's transcripts; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAppeal Document B317441 & B320358; DCA Consolidation Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,920 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketDocument:Lis Pendens, Notice of Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketDocument:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketDocument:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketDocument:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketDocument:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 08/01/17 at 8:30 am Ruth Ann Kwan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv 06/05/17 at 8:30 am Ruth Ann Kwan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Quiet Title

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****6002 Hearing Date: September 14, 2021 Dept: 72

MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

[CCP ;877.6]

Date: 9/14/21 (8:30 AM)

Case: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Co. et al. v. Rickley et al. (****6002)

TENTATIVE RULING:

There being no opposition thereto, cross-defendant RD Builders, Inc.’s Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination is GRANTED. (City of Grand Terrace v. Superior Court (1987) 192 Cal.App.3d 1251, 1261.) The Court finds that the settlement between cross-complainants Rebecca Rickley and Natasha Roit and moving cross-defendant was entered into in good faith.

Cross-defendant RD Builders, Inc. is discharged from all liability on claims for equitable contribution and/or full or partial indemnity by other parties, joint tortfeasors, or co-obligors, in this or any other action arising from the same general set of facts.

'