This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 06:05:59 (UTC).

TERRY LAC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 TERRY LAC was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3854

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAC MACY

Not Classified By Court

LAC TERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TRAN HUNG BAN

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirm Trustee; And Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust

4/21/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirm Trustee; And Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust

Supplement - First Supplement

9/1/2021: Supplement - First Supplement

Waiver - (No Fee) - Richard's Consent & Waiver of Notice

8/31/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Richard's Consent & Waiver of Notice

Waiver - (No Fee) - Macy's Consent & Waiver of Notice

8/31/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Macy's Consent & Waiver of Notice

Waiver - (No Fee) - Charlie's Consent & Waiver of Notice

8/31/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Charlie's Consent & Waiver of Notice

Waiver - (No Fee) - Andrew's Consent & Waiver of Notice

8/31/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Andrew's Consent & Waiver of Notice

Minute Order

9/10/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSupplement (First Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Richard's Consent & Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Macy's Consent & Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Charlie's Consent & Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Andrew's Consent & Waiver of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirm Trustee; And Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN HUNG BAN