This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 07:28:38 (UTC).

TERRY L. BROWN VS. DESHON L. PREDOM

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 TERRY L BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DESHON L PREDOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7013

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN TERRY L.

Defendant

PREDOM DESHON L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON MARK A.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

3/16/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

SUMMONS

3/16/2017: SUMMONS

SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PERSONAL INJURY COURT

10/24/2016: SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PERSONAL INJURY COURT

COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE PERSONAL INJURIES

3/16/2017: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE PERSONAL INJURIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED DESHON L. PREDOM ON 06/23/17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less