This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 20:58:36 (UTC).

TERRY , DEWEY STEVEN , JR - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 TERRY , DEWEY STEVEN , JR - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5011

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TERRY DEWEY STEVEN III

Decedent

TERRY DEWEY STEVEN JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OMOTOSHO AYODELE O

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

5/20/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Minute Order

6/22/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

7/7/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/15/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Minute Order

8/20/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • Hearing10/29/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OMOTOSHO, AYODELE