This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2021 at 15:52:12 (UTC).

TERRY CARTER, ET AL. VS SONA MARKOSYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 TERRY CARTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SONA MARKOSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6843

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARTER TERRY

KABIGTING HAYDEE

Defendants

MKRTCHYAN LIANA

MARKOSYAN SONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

ZEESMAN DIANA

Defendant Attorney

ASH PAUL V

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/25/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/14/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2024
  • Hearing05/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Hearing10/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sona Markosyan (Defendant); Liana Mkrtchyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Terry Carter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Terry Carter (Plaintiff); Haydee Kabigting (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Terry Carter (Plaintiff); Haydee Kabigting (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Terry Carter (Plaintiff); Haydee Kabigting (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASH PAUL V.