This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:40:58 (UTC).

TERRY BRIGGS VS MEENAS CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2017 TERRY BRIGGS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MEENAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6015

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIGGS TERRY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CREDIAUTO CAPITAL LLC

SUN AUTO FINANCE

MEENAS CORPORATION

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

CREDIAUTO FINANCIAL

DAMMANWALLA FAYYAZ

Respondents and Defendants

SUN AUTO FINANCE

CREDIAUTO FINANCIAL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ROSNER HALLEN D. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

ELLIOTT ANDREW S.

WARD THOMAS J. ESQ.

TOMLIN TIMOTHY J. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TOMLIN TIMOTHY J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/16/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF SETTLED COMPLAINT

2/20/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF SETTLED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/25/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

5/23/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service

11/21/2017: Proof of Service

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/4/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ONLY

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ONLY

Minute Order

12/18/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT SUN AUTO FINANCE

10/24/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT SUN AUTO FINANCE

PROOF OF SERVICE

8/29/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

COMPLAINT FOR: I. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES ACT, CIVIL CODE ? 1750 ET SEQ.

1/11/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: I. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES ACT, CIVIL CODE ? 1750 ET SEQ.

PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ACTUAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES [CODE OF CIV. PROC. ?425.115]

1/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ACTUAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES [CODE OF CIV. PROC. ?425.115]

PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE ?1780(D)

1/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE ?1780(D)

SUMMONS

1/11/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/6/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/9/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/9/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Terry Briggs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Terry Briggs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Terry Briggs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF SETTLED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Terry Briggs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Terry Briggs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Terry Briggs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ACTUAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES [CODE OF CIV. PROC. 425.115]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: I. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES ACT, CIVIL CODE 1750 ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Terry Briggs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

RBB LAW GROUP

ROSNER, BARRY & BABBITT, LLP Hallen D. Rosner SBN: 109740 David L, Herman SBN: 216469 10085 Carroll Canyon Road, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92131

Telephone: (858) 348-1005 Facsimile: (858) 348-1150 hal@rbblawgroup.com david@rbblawgroup.com

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Fax 858-348-1150

FILED

Sugerior Court of California ounty of Los Angeles

DEC 11 2007

Sherri B, Carter, E ' icer/Clerk By , Deputy Ricardo +erez

SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - STANLEY MOSK COURTHOQUSE

TERRY BRIGGS, an individual, Plaintaff,

MEENA’S CORPORATION dba SUN AUTO

FINANCE, a corporation; CREDIAUTO CAPITAL, LLC dba CREDIAUTO FINANCIAL a limited liability company;

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE

COMPANY, a corporation; and DOES 1 through

75, inclusive,

Defendants.

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTION

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTAE2PSPIAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ONLY

" Case No. BC646015

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT ONLY

Judge: Hon. Rafael Ongkeko Dept: 73

Complaint Filed: January 11, 2017 Trial Date: Japuary 2, 2018

Dec 11 2017 03:58pm P002/005

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIAUTO CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUN AUTO FINANCE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tomlin, Timothy J.