This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2021 at 05:39:57 (UTC).

TERRI WATSON VS SEBASTIAN JUAREZ

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 TERRI WATSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SEBASTIAN JUAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7564

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATSON TERRI

Defendant

JUAREZ SEBASTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MAYER JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/22/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

8/5/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

10/2/2020: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

1/8/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by TERRI WATSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by TERRI WATSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SEBASTIAN JUAREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TERRI WATSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TERRI WATSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TERRI WATSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TERRI WATSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less