This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:51:33 (UTC).

TERRENCE RICHARD VS UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 TERRENCE RICHARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5842

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

RICHARD TERRENCE

Defendants and Respondents

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

RUSSO VICTOR A.

PETRU ANTHONY S. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIBBONS ROBERT JOHN

QUINN STEPHANIE L.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/19/2017: DEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

6/20/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/20/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANCE JURY FEES

10/4/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANCE JURY FEES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR MICHAEL L. JOHNSON AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR MICHAEL L. JOHNSON AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Notice

11/5/2018: Notice

Unknown

11/1/2018: Unknown

Ex Parte Application

10/29/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

10/29/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/30/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF MICHAEL L. JOHNSON AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

8/29/2018: NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF MICHAEL L. JOHNSON AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNotice (Of Continued Trial And Final Status Conference); Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (To Continue Trial Per Stipulation); Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNotice (of Association of Counsel); Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice (of removal of Michael L. Johnson as counsel of record for defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company); Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANCE JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Terrence Richard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Terrence Richard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Terrence Richard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5842    Hearing Date: August 25, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Spring Street Courthouse, Department 32

terrence Richard ,

Plaintiff,

v.

union pacific railraod company,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****5842

Hearing Date: August 25, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION FOR SUMMARY adjudication

Plaintiff Terrence Richard (“Plaintiff”) was an employee of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (“Defendant”) who was injured when he fell from the rear of a moving train on February 21, 2016. Plaintiff asserts causes of action for General Negligence and under the Federal Employers’ Liability Act, 45 U.S.C. section 51, et seq. (“FELA”). Now, Defendant moves for summary adjudication of the FELA claim. On March 11, 2020, prior to the original hearing date on this motion, Plaintiff filed a notice of non-opposition. Therefore, Defendant’s motion for summary adjudication on the FELA cause of action is granted. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: August 25, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETRU ANTHONY S. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSO VICTOR A.