This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 17:12:43 (UTC).

TERRENCE MONARCH VS WILLIAM RICHARD HARRITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 TERRENCE MONARCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILLIAM RICHARD HARRITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON, JR. and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5878

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONARCH TERRENCE

Defendants

HARRITY WILLIAM RICHARD

HARRITY NICOLE

HARRITY ALEXANDER

SUSNAR NICOLE

SUSNAR CHERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOFONIO REX PATRICK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. ASSAULT; ETC

6/20/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. ASSAULT; ETC

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

6/19/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

3/13/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 03/11/2021

3/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 03/11/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

10/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 10/28/2020

10/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 10/28/2020

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

9/4/2020: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

8/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Request for Dismissal

8/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF SCHEDULED HEARING

7/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF SCHEDULED HEARING

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SCHEDULED HEARING

8/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SCHEDULED HEARING

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment) of 03/11/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 03/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to 03/11/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TERRENCE MONARCH on 06/20/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to Plaintiff's failure to appear this date and lack of prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 03/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/11/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Failure to File Default Judgment) of 10/28/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketDocument:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 12/11/18 at 10:00 am Holly J. Fujie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 12/27/18 at 8:30 am Holly J. Fujie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 06/29/20 at 8:30 am Holly J. Fujie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Intentional PI/PD/WD (eg. assault)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5878    Hearing Date: October 28, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TERRENCE MONARCH,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

WILLIAM RICHARD HARRITY, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****5878

ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 27

Plaintiff Terrence Monarch(“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants William Richard Harrity, Nicole Harrity, Alexander Harrity, Nicole Susnar and Cheri Susnar. On September 3, 2020, Nicole Harrity was dismissed. Plaintiff seeks default judgment against the remaining four Defendants.

On March 17, 2020, Plaintiff’s application for default was denied for several reasons. While some of the procedural defects identified in the March 17 minute order have been remedied, Plaintiff’s application is missing several papers required by CRC 3.1800.

Plaintiff’s application for default judgment is DENIED.

Dated this 28th day of October 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court