This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 00:01:14 (UTC).

TERRENCE MCRAE VS TRANSPORTATION BROKERAGE SPECIALISTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 TERRENCE MCRAE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TRANSPORTATION BROKERAGE SPECIALISTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8490

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCRAE TERRENCE

Defendant

TRANSPORTATION BROKERAGE SPECIALISTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAYTON CHANTAL

MANN MATTHEW L

ROGAL JUSTIN REUBEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/4/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Terrence McRae (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Terrence McRae (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Terrence McRae (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Terrence McRae (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION BROKERAGE SPECIALISTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAYTON CHANTAL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANN MATTHEW L