This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 00:13:47 (UTC).

TERESA Z YOUHANAIE VS LAEC INCORPORATED ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 TERESA Z YOUHANAIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LAEC INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1781

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUHANAIE TERESA Z.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GRIFFITH PARK HORSE RENTALS

LAEC INCORPORATED

SCHAD JULIE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SCHAD JULIE

HORSE SERVICES INC. DBA GRIFFITH PARK HORSE RENTALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGONIGLE TIMOTHY DESIDERIO ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

FRESCH ELAINE

Cross Defendant Attorney

ASIANO ANN MARILYNNE

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/11/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Unknown

8/3/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT LAEC INCORPORATED'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE; EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIE

8/23/2018: DEFENDANT LAEC INCORPORATED'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE; EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIE

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LAEC INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

8/23/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LAEC INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Minute Order

8/23/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT LAEC INCORPORATED'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANN M. ASIANO; DECLARATION OF BENEDICT E. IDEMUNDI

9/21/2018: DEFENDANT LAEC INCORPORATED'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANN M. ASIANO; DECLARATION OF BENEDICT E. IDEMUNDI

Opposition

10/10/2018: Opposition

Reply

10/16/2018: Reply

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Order

10/23/2018: Order

Notice

10/24/2018: Notice

Cross-Complaint

1/16/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons

1/16/2019: Summons

Motion to Compel

1/17/2019: Motion to Compel

Ex Parte Application

1/30/2019: Ex Parte Application

Unknown

1/30/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

1/31/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Lodging

2/8/2019: Notice of Lodging

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT?S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION); Filed by TERESA Z. YOUHANAIE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT); Filed by TERESA Z. YOUHANAIE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion); Filed by TERESA Z. YOUHANAIE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Hearing ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by TERESA Z. YOUHANAIE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by TERESA Z. YOUHANAIE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Horse Services, Inc. DBA Griffith Park Horse Rentals Erroneously Sued As GRIFFITH PARK HORSE RENTALS (Defendant); JULIE SCHAD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TERESA Z. YOUHANAIE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1781    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 5

Teresa Z. Youhanaie v. LAEC Incorporated, et al.

Case No. ****1781

The Court has no tentative order on this motion.  Any party who does not appear at the hearing shall waive their right to be heard and shall submit on the briefs. 



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRIFFITH PARK HORSE RENTALS is a litigant

Latest cases where LAEC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASIANO ANN M.