Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 00:27:48 (UTC).

TERESA VILLASENOR-HARRIS VS CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 TERESA VILLASENOR-HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4762

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLASENOR-HARRIS TERESA

Defendant

CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM SUNG H.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY; NON-APPEARANCE CAS...)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY; NON-APPEARANCE CAS...)

Request - REQUEST TO LIFT THE AUTOMATIC BANKRUPTCY STAY PER THE BANKRUPTCY ORDER OF OCTOBER 29, 2020

12/4/2020: Request - REQUEST TO LIFT THE AUTOMATIC BANKRUPTCY STAY PER THE BANKRUPTCY ORDER OF OCTOBER 29, 2020

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/28/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

9/30/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING REVIEW HEARING) OF 09/30/2020

9/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING REVIEW HEARING) OF 09/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING REVIEW HEARING)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING REVIEW HEARING)

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

9/30/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/22/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/11/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Hearing03/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Hearing03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy; Non-Appearance Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketRequest (to Lift the Automatic Bankruptcy Stay per The Bankruptcy Order of October 29, 2020); Filed by Teresa Villasenor-Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by California Pizza Kitchen, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Setting Review Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Review Hearing) of 09/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Teresa Villasenor-Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Teresa Villasenor-Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Teresa Villasenor-Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Teresa Villasenor-Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Pizza Kitchen, Inc. D/B/A California Pizza Kitchen is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM SUNG H.