This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 06:31:03 (UTC).

TERESA SHORTER VS ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 TERESA SHORTER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MORGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0199

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN MORGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHORTER TERESA

Defendants

ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

SHAH NITIN A MD

KRISHNA DODDANNA MD

HINGARH NILESH H MD

COMPOGINIS JOHN M MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVACK BARRY BERNARD

Defendant Attorneys

TROTTER MATTHEW NORMANLY

DEHERAS DOUGLAS SEAN

FINLAY CAMPBELL HODGES

LAMB MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

1/26/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/26/2022: Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/26/2022: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal

2/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/24/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) OF 02/25/2022

2/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) OF 02/25/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)

2/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

3/11/2022: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

3/11/2022: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/23/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Continuance

3/25/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Other - - OTHER - EXHIBITS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL WINOKUR; EXHIBITS1-4

3/28/2022: Other - - OTHER - EXHIBITS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL WINOKUR; EXHIBITS1-4

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/28/2022: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/28/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY TO DEFENDANT'S MSJ

3/28/2022: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY TO DEFENDANT'S MSJ

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Hearing11/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Court's Ability to Make a Determination Regarding a Dismissed Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department A14; Informal Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Court's Ability to Make a Determination Regarding a Dismissed Defendant) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Court's Ability to Make a Determinati...) of 04/20/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Court's Ability to Make a Determinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Nitin A Shah, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nitin A Shah, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nitin A Shah, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Antelope Valley Healthcare District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Antelope Valley Healthcare District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Doddanna Krishna, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Teresa Shorter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Teresa Shorter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Teresa Shorter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVACK BARRY BERNARD