This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2023 at 08:34:19 (UTC).

TERESA SHANNON VS EVAN FARR, DDS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 TERESA SHANNON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EVAN FARR, DDS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, YOLANDA OROZCO, JOHN P. DOYLE and CHARLES C. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5568

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

YOLANDA OROZCO

JOHN P. DOYLE

CHARLES C. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANNON TERESA

Defendants

FARR EVAN DDS

GABI TZUR DMD

GREENSKY PATIENT SOLUTIONS

SANTO TOMAS DENTAL GROUP

GREENSKY OF GEORGIA LLC DOE 26

EVAN FARR DDS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEBBY MARVIN S

Defendant Attorneys

KINAN TOM

KAMEL BRIAN P.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 06/26/2023

6/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 06/26/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

6/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

6/13/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

4/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

4/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/8/2023: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/24/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: SANCT...)

2/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: SANCT...)

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2024
  • Hearing08/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2024
  • Hearing08/12/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2024
  • Hearing05/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 06/26/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 09/12/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 08/12/2024 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/12/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 05/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketAddress for Marvin S Shebby (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Teresa Shannon (Plaintiff); As to: Evan Farr, DDS (Defendant); Tzur Gabi, DMD (Defendant); Evan Farr, DDS, INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Teresa Shannon (Plaintiff); As to: Evan Farr, DDS (Defendant); Tzur Gabi, DMD (Defendant); Evan Farr, DDS, INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Teresa Shannon (Plaintiff); As to: Evan Farr, DDS (Defendant); Tzur Gabi, DMD (Defendant); Evan Farr, DDS, INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAffidavit re Venue; Filed by: Teresa Shannon (Plaintiff); As to: Evan Farr, DDS (Defendant); Tzur Gabi, DMD (Defendant); Evan Farr, DDS, INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less