This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 05:34:21 (UTC).

TERESA RODRIGUEZ VS SLAUSON DISTRIBUTION CENTER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 TERESA RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SLAUSON DISTRIBUTION CENTER, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9515

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ TERESA

Defendants

CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF VERNON A PUBLIC ENTITY

SLAUSON DISTRIBUTION CENTER LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

FULLMER CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED MUAMMAR

Defendant Attorneys

GIBBS MATTHEW S.

MEDELLIN SHARON

LEVITT SCOTT LAMONT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

1/19/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/19/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

1/13/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/30/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

7/20/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/28/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/9/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

5/13/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/13/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/17/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2025
  • Hearing03/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • Hearing08/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: SLAUSON DISTRIBUTION CENTER, LTD, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant); As to: TERESA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: CITY OF VERNON, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketAddress for Nicholas A. Medina (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TERESA RODRIGUEZ on 03/17/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by TERESA RODRIGUEZ as to CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, a public entity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: TERESA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Fullmer Construction (Defendant); As to: TERESA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TERESA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: Fullmer Construction (Defendant); Service Date: 12/09/2022; Service Cost: 108.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TERESA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: SLAUSON DISTRIBUTION CENTER, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, a public entity (Defendant); CITY OF VERNON, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TERESA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: SLAUSON DISTRIBUTION CENTER, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, a public entity (Defendant); CITY OF VERNON, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TERESA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: SLAUSON DISTRIBUTION CENTER, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, a public entity (Defendant); CITY OF VERNON, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less