This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 05:48:09 (UTC).

TERESA J. APOLINAR VS JORGE APOLINAR

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 TERESA J APOLINAR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JORGE APOLINAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0490

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APOLINAR TERESA J.

Defendant

APOLINAR JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKMAN RYAN EUGENE

STELNICK STEFFANIE DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

8/24/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/24/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFF TERESA APOLINAR'S OMITTED EXHIBIT ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFF TERESA APOLINAR'S OMITTED EXHIBIT ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • Hearing07/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Teresa J. Apolinar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Teresa J. Apolinar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Errata Regarding Plaintiff Teresa Apolinar's Omitted Exhibit on Complaint; Filed by Teresa J. Apolinar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Teresa J. Apolinar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Teresa J. Apolinar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Teresa J. Apolinar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACKMAN RYAN EUGENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STELNICK STEFFANIE DANIELLE